U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diboh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.