U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.