U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 22, 2022: [Information - Felony]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.