U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rumler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 19, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.