U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thorton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.