U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 01, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 05, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.