U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Payne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • June 15, 2022: [Claim]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • May 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.