U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01429-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz Rosado
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.