U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01428-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arriola
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.