U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01427-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acuna
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.