U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01436-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silva
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.