U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01434-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.