U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01431-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.