U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01450-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ross
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2022: [Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.