U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Guzman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.