U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunicke
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 10, 2022: [Dismiss ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • May 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.