U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 03, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.