U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-ct-03240
  • Case Name: Frederick v. Ramsey et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Document]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 29, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Dever]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • May 06, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • May 06, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • May 06, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.