U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis, II
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 12, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 13, 2022: [Bond]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.