U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03151
  • Case Name: Carter v. Drago-Castano et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 24, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 24, 2022: [Selection of Mediator]
  • August 23, 2022: [Rule 26(f) Report (joint)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order for Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.