U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02083
  • Case Name: Bryan v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • September 29, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • September 29, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 29, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.