U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.