U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Callahan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 16, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.