U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02084
  • Case Name: Whitcher v. Stein et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.