U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edgell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.