U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bautista-Sosa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.