U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.