U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03152
  • Case Name: DeCory v. Anderson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 30, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.