U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00025-11
  • Case Name: USA v. OVIEDO, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order re Compassionate Release Motion to Reduce Sentence (2255)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2024: [SEALED Document]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Rescheduling]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 27, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • November 27, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 26, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • October 13, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • October 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 28, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • September 16, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Docketing Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 14, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 09, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 26, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 24, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 24, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 23, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 23, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 17, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 08, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 14, 2022: [Status Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 26, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.