U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02085
  • Case Name: Giffen v. Biden et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.