U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01455-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.