U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cagnoni Dias
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.