U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03153
  • Case Name: Pruitt v. Deangelo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 04, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • January 04, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • January 04, 2023: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 04, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • August 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 16, 2022: [Take Deposition]
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • July 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 12, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.