U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03157
  • Case Name: Sherrod v. Stein et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.