U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03156
  • Case Name: Land v. N.C. DPS Health Providers et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.