U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03155
  • Case Name: Steepleton v. Dudley et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Rejection/Acceptance of Assistance from NCPLS]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice to Plaintiff Regarding North Carolina Prisoner Legal Services Inc]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.