U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03154
  • Case Name: Davis v. John Doe et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.