U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03165
  • Case Name: Brown v. NC Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2022: [Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.