U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03162
  • Case Name: Martin v. Locklear et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.