U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03161
  • Case Name: Stephen v. Baker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.