U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02087
  • Case Name: Mims v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Directing Return of Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.