U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03160
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Seal]
  • November 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice-other]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 06, 2022: [Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.