U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03158
  • Case Name: Pittman v. Dennison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • October 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 21, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 18, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.