U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03163
  • Case Name: Burghart v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 14, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Recusal]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Document]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • July 13, 2022: [Response]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • May 13, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.