U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alarcon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.