U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02088
  • Case Name: Sutherland v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • December 06, 2022: [Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 19, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 02, 2022: [Response to Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.