U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Armstrong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 06, 2023: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • September 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 14, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 14, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.