U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hess et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 13, 2023: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Factual Basis]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 11, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arrest]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 27, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.