U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Byers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • July 20, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arrest]
  • July 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.