U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mobley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2022: [Indictment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.